HI SB305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that video monitoring and recording of medical marijuana production center and retail dispensing location premises shall be retained for a period of forty-five days. (SB305 HD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Marijuana Dispensaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-21 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 395). |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1575), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Tupola; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Har; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 119) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 675) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-22-17 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Kidani. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB305 (Carry Over) 2017-04-21 - The conference committee deferred the measure.