HI SB3025 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-24 at 3:30PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-24 at 3:30PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for additional rules by the Department of Agriculture to address nuisance issues, including smell, noise, and excessive lighting arising out of the activities of hemp growers. Clarifies that the Department of Agriculture shall not require inspections or sampling of hemp that duplicates inspections or sampling required by the United States Department of Agriculture. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-25-24 at 3:30PM in Conference Room 325. |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 11:05AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-24 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-24 11:05AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 759). |
2024-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-24 11:05AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 686). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Richards. |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Takayama, Ward. |
2024-04-02 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 355). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 507). |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan. |
2024-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-03-13 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-13-24 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 248). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2871) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2542) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-12-24 1:32PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 02-09-24 1:06PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2336 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to AEN, JDC.