HI SB3007 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Re-Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the department of airports. Transfers the airport and aeronautics functions of DOT to the department of airports by the established transfer completion date agreed upon by the director of airports, the director of transportation, and the governor. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To A Department Of Airports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/GVO, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2637 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - Referred to TRN, LAB/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3007&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB3007_.HTM |