HI SB3 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB3

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the court to appoint an attorney to represent the respondent in a guardianship petition. Requires the court appointed attorney to meet with the respondent at least once prior to the guardianship petition hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Guardianship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2019-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB3 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback