HI SB2993 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any operator, transient accommodations broker, or person from offering, listing, advertising, and displaying a rate that does not include all resort fees. Requires all operators, transient accommodations brokers, and persons to include all taxes and fees imposed by a government on a transient accommodation. Establish penalties.
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/EET deferred the measure until 02-14-24 9:45AM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 9:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPN/EET, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Government Taxes and Fees
Penalties
Resort Fees
Total Booking Price
Transient Accommodations
Government Taxes and Fees
Penalties
Resort Fees
Total Booking Price
Transient Accommodations
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2993&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2993_.HTM |