HI SB299 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB299
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of education to hold no less than six community meetings each year; provided that at least one meeting shall be held in each county. Requires the board of education to allow public testimony on items not on a public meeting agenda if certain requirements are met. Repeals the public testimony requirement on June 30, 2024. Requires the board of education to report to the legislature.
Title
Relating To The Board Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB411 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB299 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
SB299 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=299&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB299_.HTM |