HI SB2988 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-21 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-21 - (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of finance to restructure the debt service for state obligations; provided that any such restructuring shall take into consideration the long-term financial obligations of the State and shall not be undertaken solely to provide short-term savings.
Title
State Funds; Debt Service; Restructuring
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25). | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Tokuda). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) One Day Notice 02-16-12. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2175) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-10-12 11:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |