HI SB2982 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-20 8:30AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-20 8:30AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets a date for the transition of the Oahu region's health care facilities from the Hawaii health systems corporation to the department of health. Establishes a working group to develop a comprehensive plan that addresses all necessary components of such transition.
Title
Relating To The Transition Of The Oahu Regional Health Care System From The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation Into The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-20 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-07-20 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2630 (Same As) 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2982&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2982_.HTM |