HI SB2976 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county board of water supply or water board to prioritize the sustainable recharge of aquifers, ensure the health of watersheds, and, when allocating water for new development, prioritize the development of affordable housing over other types of development. Provides that these requirements shall not be construed to affect allocations of water for agricultural purposes or developments under the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act, 1920, as amended.
Title
Relating To Water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/GVO/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/GVO/HOU, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM/HOU, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2695 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to WTL/GVO/HOU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2976&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2976_.HTM |