HI SB2972 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deposits revenue from the State Veterinary Laboratory and Animal Control Branch into the Animal Industry Special Fund and allows funds from the special fund to be expended to make laboratory improvements.
Title
Relating To The Animal Industry Special Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2598) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 1:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |