HI SB2969 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Taxation to allow a taxpayer to designate that a specified amount of the taxpayer's income tax refund be paid to the Early Learning Trust Fund. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2969 HD1)
Title
Early Learning System Funding; Income Tax Refund Check-Off
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1106-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Awana, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Chang, Mizuno, Saiki. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-14-12 2:10PM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 377) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Solomon . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2761) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2203) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |