HI SB2963 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a cable operator to disclose the minimum average bandwidth that shall be provided and maximum bandwidth available.
Title
Cable Service; Wireless Communications; Bandwidth; Disclosures
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2447 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 5
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2963&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2963_.HTM |