HI SB2962 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment that ensures that the fundamental right of the people, including future generations, to clean water and air, a healthful environment and climate, healthy native ecosystems, and beaches, shall be protected and shall not be infringed. (SD1)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article I Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Recognize And Protect The Inherent And Inalienable Right Of All People To Clean Water And Air And Healthy Ecosystems, Including Climate, And To The Preservation Of The Natural, Cultural, Scenic, And Healthful Qualities Of The Environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM deferred the measure until 03-04-22 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2595) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1803 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).