HI SB2953 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain private streets, highways, or thoroughfares in a commercial development district of the HCDA to conform to county construction and maintenance standards. Requires owners who exercise ownership rights for financial gain or profit of private streets, highways, or thoroughfares in a commercial development district to be responsible for the costs of conforming and maintaining the private roads to county standards. Authorizes private civil injunctive actions in the circuit courts to enforce compliance. Repeal on 6/30/2023. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2364) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 9:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2275 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - Act 009, 05/01/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).