HI SB2942 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the board of land and natural resources to amend any appropriate administrative rules to increase archaeological permit fees from the current rate of $50 to an unspecified amount; specifies that the permit fees are to be deposited into the Hawaii historic preservation special fund established under section 6E-16, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Historic Preservation; Archaeological Permit Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-14-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2942 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2942_.HTM |