HI SB2939 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 8:35AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 8:35AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes extended terms of imprisonment for certain offenses against property rights committed on agricultural lands. Takes effect 6/18/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Crimes On Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 8:35AM in conference room 312. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-20 8:35AM in conference room 312. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-20. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-13-20 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 440) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3091) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-20 10:01AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |