HI SB2939 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Act 005, 04/24/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1105).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Act 005, 04/24/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1105).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
On or before January 1, 2020, requires the PUC to establish performance incentive and penalty mechanisms that directly tie electric utility revenues to the utility's achievement on performance metrics. Exempts member-owned cooperative electric utilities. Effective 7/1/2018. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Act 005, 04/24/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1105). |
2018-04-24 | House | Act 005, on 04/24/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1105). |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 607). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1965-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:35PM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3). |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1237-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 370) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2744) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2478) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-15-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Electric Utilities
Performance Incentive and Penalty Mechanisms
Public Utilities Commission
Ratepayer Protection Act
Performance Incentive and Penalty Mechanisms
Public Utilities Commission
Ratepayer Protection Act