HI SB2921 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:30AM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:30AM in conference room 309.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the due date for employers to file the wage and tax statement from the last day of February to January 31 following the close of the calendar year. Imposes a penalty on employers that fail to timely furnish and file, or file electronically if required, the wage and tax statement. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Withholding Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-17-20 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 436) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3010) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2365 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Har excused (2).