HI SB2884 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides employer contribution amounts for Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund health benefits plan premiums for plan years 2009-2010 and 2010-2011 for employees of collective bargaining units (1) and (10) and their excluded counterparts. Effective July 1, 2020. (SB2884 HD2)
Title
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Taniguchi. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 434). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Bertram, Hanohano excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1235-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Finnegan. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-31-10 6:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Chang, Manahan, Sagum, Souki excused (5). | |
2010-03-17 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 803-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-12-10 10:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 303) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2451) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:10AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 3:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2936 (Same As) 2010-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.