HI SB2879 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the wording from "foster boarding home" to "resource family home" and "foster parents" to "resource caregivers"; establishes qualified immunity for resource caregivers and child caring institutions; adds the requirement that resource caregivers and child care institutions use the reasonable and prudent parent standard when authorizing children in foster care to participate in activities; and changes from sixteen to fourteen years the minimum age at which children in foster care are to be involved in their foster care plans. (SD1)
Title
Foster Children; Caregiver; Prudent Parent Standard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2069) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2350 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Act 133, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).