HI SB2877 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 084, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 084, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits transfer of use permit for a state small boat harbor facility unless specifically provided by law. Allows certain changes in control by parent-subsidiary, brother-sister, or constructive owner possessing permit without loss of right to retain or renew permit. Exempts seller who transfers interest between spouses and children for estate planning from paying Department of Land and Natural Resources passenger-carrying capacity business transfer fee. (CD1)
Title
Use Permits; Small Boat Harbors
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Act 084, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185). |
2014-06-18 | House | Act 084, on 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185). |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 4-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11-14). |
2014-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Hanohano, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 2:20PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 8:30AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Solomon Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Galuteria, Taniguchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Lowen Co-Chairs; Hanohano, Say, Fale Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 625). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1599-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Tokioka excused (2). |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-14-14 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-07 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-14 at 11:30am. |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-07-14 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2014-02-28 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 48) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-27-14. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ihara, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-14 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2327 (Same As) 2014-02-07 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.