HI SB2876 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 313, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1430).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a State harbors civil violations system and general administrative penalties for violations of laws and rules governing Hawaii's harbors. Provides that penalties and fines are deposited into the Harbor Special Fund. Allows the Department of Transportation to seek reimbursement from tenants or harbor users that violate security rules in harbor-secured areas. (SB2876 HD3)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation, Harbors; Administrative Violations of Rules; Reimbursement from Tenant for Security Violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Act 313, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1430).
2012-07-10 (H) Act 313, on 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1430).
2012-05-08 (S) Enrolled to Governor.
2012-05-01 (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 832).
2012-05-01 (S) Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2012-04-27 (S) One Day Notice 05-01-12.
2012-04-27 (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-01-12.
2012-04-27 (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2012-04-26 (S) The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kidani, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2012-04-24 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 2:10PM in conference room 224.
2012-04-20 (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 2:30PM in conference room 224.
2012-04-19 (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-12 2:15PM in conference room 224.
2012-04-17 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2012-04-16 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2012-04-16 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; English, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Solomon, Slom.
2012-04-16 (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Keith-Agaran, Ichiyama Co-Chairs; Fontaine.
2012-04-12 (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679).
2012-04-12 (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments.
2012-04-12 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 524).
2012-04-10 (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-04-05 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12.
2012-04-05 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1630-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2012-04-03 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2012-03-31 (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-02-12 5:15PM in conference room 308.
2012-03-29 (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2012-03-28 (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2012-03-27 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2012-03-23 (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1).
2012-03-23 (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2012-03-22 (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Herkes.
2012-03-20 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-22-12 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
2012-03-16 (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4).
2012-03-16 (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1040-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2012-03-12 (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki.
2012-03-09 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-12-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2012-03-08 (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
2012-03-08 (H) Pass First Reading
2012-03-06 (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 353) in amended form (SD 2).
2012-03-06 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-03-02 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12.
2012-03-02 (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2804) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2012-02-28 (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom.
2012-02-22 (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2012-02-16 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2012-02-16 (S) Reported from WLH/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2243) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2012-02-13 (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom.
2012-02-13 (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-02-09 (S) The committee(s) on WLH/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-12 1:20PM in conference room 224.
2012-02-06 (S) Re-Referred to WLH/TIA, WAM.
2012-01-25 (S) Referred to WLH/TIA/JDL, WAM.
2012-01-25 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-01-25 (S) Introduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2614 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - (S) Referred to WLH/TIA, WAM.

Hawaii State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2876
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2876_.htm
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2876_SD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2876_SD1_SSCR2243_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2876_SD2_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2876_SD2_SSCR2804_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2876_HD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2876_HD1_HSCR1040-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2876_HD2_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2876_HD2_HSCR1311-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2876_HD3_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2876_HD3_HSCR1630-12_.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback