HI SB2870 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the Employees' Retirement System's eligibility requirement definitions for service-connected disability and accidental death benefits. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Employees' Retirement System Disability Retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2862) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2314 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.