HI SB2860 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 23
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the board member terms in sections 457-3 and 468E-6(c), Hawaii Revised Statutes, from three years to four years to align the terms of members of the Board of Nursing and the Board of Speech Pathology and Audiology with the terms of members of the other twenty-three boards and commissions under the Professional and Vocational Licensing Division of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs.
Title
Increase Board Terms from Three to Four Years; Board of Nursing; Board of Speech Pathology and Audiology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 23 |
2016-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-02-24 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 28). |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-24-16. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2487) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2331 (Same As) 2016-04-20 - Act 008, on 04/19/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2860&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2860_.HTM |