HI SB286 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reapportionment to be based in part on population data of the total number of permanent residents in the State. Defines "permanent resident" for legislative reapportionment as any individual counted as a usual resident in the last preceding U.S. census within the State of Hawaii. (SB286 HD1)
Title
Reapportionment; Definition of "permanent resident"; Census
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2014-02-18 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-25 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; Belatti, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement and Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 596). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Deferred until 04-05-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 416). |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ichiyama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman, Jordan, McKelvey voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito. |
2013-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-13 2:00PM. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 103) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Green, Hee, Kahele, Ruderman . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Solomon). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 636) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |