HI SB286 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the board of agriculture to designate agents to inspect agricultural commodities in underserved, remote areas.
Title
Agricultural Commodities; Inspectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in AGL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-01-11 2:55PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=286 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB286_.HTM |