HI SB2851 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Act 018, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Act 018, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes and the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purposes of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, and deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Statutory Revision: Amending Or Repealing Various Provisions Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes And The Session Laws Of Hawaii For The Purposes Of Correcting Errors And References, Clarifying Language, And Deleting Obsolete Or Unnecessary Provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Act 018, 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118). |
2018-06-06 | House | Act 018, on 06/04/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1118). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 65-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 65-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Kim, Taniguchi. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 598). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1882-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McDermott. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 337) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2643) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2183 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 8