HI SB2831 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - (H) Act 107, on 5/13/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - (H) Act 107, on 5/13/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 321).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the requirements for withholding payment to a subcontractor effectuated by Act 175, Session Laws of Hawaii 2009. (CD1)
Title
Procurement Code; Subcontractors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | (H) Act 107, on 5/13/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 321). | |
2010-05-13 | (S) Act 107, 5/13/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 565). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82-10). | |
2010-04-19 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-10 4:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Choy Co-Chairs; Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Takamine, Slom. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 409). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1175-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Coffman, Keith-Agaran. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-25-10 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4). | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 767-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Takai, Wakai. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 03-11-10 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 35 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 286) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2502) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-10 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Introduced. |