HI SB283 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 011, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 011, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Mokulele highway on Maui as the Maui veterans highway.
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Act 011, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Act 011, 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111). |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 542). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki, Souki excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 03-22-17. |
2017-04-07 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 40 |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3). |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1205), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi, Woodson. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to VMI, TRN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 111). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 694) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/IAA. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB545 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to VMI, TRN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=283&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB283_.HTM |