HI SB2821 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 027, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Act 027, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms Hawaii income and estate and generation-skipping transfer tax laws to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of 12/31/2017, except as provided. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Conformity To The Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Act 027, 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127). |
2018-06-13 | House | Act 027, on 06/07/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 698). |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-04-27 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 846). |
2018-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Kong, Say, Tokioka voting no (4) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tupola excused (3). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman. |
2018-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-27-18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 5-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-18. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 5-18). |
2018-04-18 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-18 2:15PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Galuteria. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 527). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey, Mizuno excused (6). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1826-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-15-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 325) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2649) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 02-08-18 and will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-08-18 11:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2394 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2017
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax