HI SB2821 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 234, 7/8/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1344).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 234, 7/8/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1344).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts revisions to the National Association of Insurance Commissioners' model laws on Credit for Reinsurance Model Act (Part I), Standard Valuation Law (Part II), Standard Nonforfeiture for Life Insurance (Part III), and Insurance Holding Company System Regulatory Act (Part IV). Part I takes effect 01/01/2015. Part IV takes effect 01/01/2016. (CD1)
Title
Insurance; Model Laws; Reinsurance; Insurance Valuation; Life Insurance; Insurance Holding Companies
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 234, 7/8/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1344). |
2014-07-08 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 234, 7/8/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1344). |
2014-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1224) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-14 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224) |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 134-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 134-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, McDermott. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:45AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Tsuji, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1535-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1202-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Har, Ito, Oshiro, McDermott. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-17-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-17-14. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-12-14. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-10-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 298) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2692) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2155) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-07-14 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2271 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.