HI SB2818 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (S) Act 075, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (S) Act 075, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the authority of the Department of Health to deliver or distribute an unclaimed dead human body to a university, hospital, or institution for medical education and research purposes. Clarifies the responsibilities of the person who has possession, charge, or control of an unclaimed dead human body with respect to gathering and providing information to state agencies. (SB2818 HD1)
Title
Dead Human Bodies; Disposition of Dead Human Bodies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (S) Act 075, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Act 075, on 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 749). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Kim. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) One Day Notice 04-16-12. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-12. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 507). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1549-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: C. Lee. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Saiki, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 977-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-09-12 10:45AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-02-21 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31). | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Kahele, Solomon). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) One Day Notice 02-21-12. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2356) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai, Slom. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-10-12 1:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH/HMS. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2556 (Same As) 2012-02-14 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).