HI SB2812 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Lowen, Perruso, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Lowen, Perruso, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that agriculture activities in non-agricultural park lands may include the care and production of pasture lands. Requires the transfer of certain lands from DLNR to DOA. Requires DLNR to accept and return to its land inventory, any parcel or portion thereof, transferred pursuant to this Act that the DOA has determined to be unsuitable or unnecessary for agricultural use. Requires reports to the Legislature on implementing the land transfers, addressing the concerns about stewardship, and compliance with the land transfers. Requires DLNR and DOA to identify potentially transferable lands whose land use classification is at dispute and petition the land use commission for a determination. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Lowen, Perruso, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-12 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1189-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-11 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Tarnas, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 379) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3394) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2674) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:35PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2577 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to AGR/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 5