HI SB2804 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes large land owners to petition the Land Use Commission to allow the development of elderly housing on portions of agricultural lands.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2804&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2804_.HTM |