HI SB2804 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - (S) Act 105, 06/08/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - (S) Act 105, 06/08/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii interagency council on homelessness under the department of human services for administrative purposes. Requires the department of human services to conduct a study on designating safe facilities for homeless individuals, couples, and families. (CD1)
Title
Homelessness; Interagency Council; Designated Safe Facilities; Department of Human Services; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | (S) Act 105, 06/08/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). | |
2012-06-13 | (H) Act 105, on 6/8/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1207). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 180-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 180-12). | |
2012-04-30 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 830). | |
2012-04-30 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Kawakami, Ito, Jordan, Mizuno, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-30 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-30 | (S) Senator(s) Ige discharged as Co-Chair(s). | |
2012-04-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-30-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 1:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 2:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-12 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Espero, Ryan, Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Ito, Jordan, Mizuno, Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 502). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ito, Coffman, Har, Kawakami, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Herkes, Pine. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 318) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2773) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2314) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 1:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2542 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 7