HI SB2788 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of the department of commerce and consumer affairs to require cable franchise operators to conduct a review and develop a technology upgrade plan every five years during the franchise agreement and to take any action indicated by the review. (SD1)
Title
Cable Television Systems
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 210) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2358) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Green, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-18-10 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-10 9:15am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |