HI SB2787 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of health to issue permits to medical cannabis dispensaries for the delivery of medical cannabis and manufactured cannabis products to qualifying patients or primary caregivers if certain conditions are met. Authorizes the department of health to issue medical cannabis transporter licenses in specific situations. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-12-20 9:00AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN , referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 371) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3139) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:30PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2703) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |