HI SB2773 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires providers authorized to prescribe opioids to discuss with patients certain risks associated with controlled substances that are opioids prior to issuing initial opioid prescriptions for the treatment of acute pain. Requires providers to include a note acknowledging the discussion of the risks associated with opioids in the patient's medical record.
Title
Relating To Opioids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-07-20 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2773&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2773_.HTM |