HI SB272 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 243, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the conditions under which condominium unit owners can install solar energy devices. Amends the definition of "solar energy devices" to include building-applied and building-integrated photovoltaics and to exclude passive solar skylights and windows. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solar Energy Devices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 243, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
2019-07-09HouseAct 243, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1345).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 50) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 50).
2019-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
2019-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 12:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 12:30PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; J.Keohokalole, Baker Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Takumi, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Cachola, Thielen.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 731).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2153), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto.
2019-04-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1598) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2019-03-14HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 83).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 909) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EET/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EET/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
2019-01-28SenateRe-Referred to EET/TEC, CPH.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to EET/TEC, WAM.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1205 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback