HI SB2712 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - (S) The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - (S) The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "medical institution". Provides for the development of a fair and equitable reimbursement system for all clients under the Medicaid program for home- and community-based caregiver services and a fair and equitable referral system for clients transferring from hospitals to community based care homes. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2712 HD2)
Title
Medicaid; Reimbursements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | (S) The conference committee deferred the measure. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Yamane, Keith-Agaran, Jordan Co-Chairs; Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 472). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1539-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1275-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Cabanilla, Herkes. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-12 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1072-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 03-15-12 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2012-02-13 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 18). | |
2012-02-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) One Day Notice 02-10-12. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2080) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-02-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2450 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HUS/HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7