HI SB270 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB270
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Act 013, 05/25/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Act 013, 05/25/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits specific state-licensed persons who are licensed to provide professional counseling from engaging in, attempting to engage in, or advertising sexual orientation change efforts on minors. Establishes the sexual orientation counseling task force to address the concerns of minors seeking counseling on sexual orientation, gender identity, gender expressions, and related behaviors. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Act 013, 05/25/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113). |
2018-05-29 | House | Act 013, on 05/25/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1113). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Kong, McDermott, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 156-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 156-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Nishimoto, Luke, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 11:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 11:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Nishimoto, Luke Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 553). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1955-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1312-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2550) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1266 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB270 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to CPH.
SB270 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Conversion Therapy
Licensed Professionals
Minors
Prohibition
Sexual Orientation Change Efforts
Sexual Orientation Counseling Task Force
Licensed Professionals
Minors
Prohibition
Sexual Orientation Change Efforts
Sexual Orientation Counseling Task Force