HI SB2697 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - (H) Act 116, on 5/18/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - (H) Act 116, on 5/18/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizes Insurance Code. Effective July 1, 2010. (CD1)
Title
Insurance Producers; Adjusters; Independent Bill Reviewers; Managing General Agents; Bail Agents; Port-of-Entry Insurance; Captive Insurance; Mutual Benefit Societies; Health Maintenance Organizations; Access to Records; Confidentiality of Documents; Interstate Insurance Product Regulation Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | (H) Act 116, on 5/18/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 331). | |
2010-05-18 | (S) Act 116, 5/18/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 574). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 78-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 78-10). | |
2010-04-19 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Karamatsu, Wakai, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-19-10 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-15-10 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Herkes, Karamatsu Co-Chairs; Wakai, Marumoto. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 487). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Deferred until 04-06-10. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Deferred until 04-01-10. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Deferred until 03-31-10. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 291). | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Herkes, M. Lee excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused (7). | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Belatti, Luke. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Karamatsu, Luke, Mizuno, Morita. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 03-11-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 243) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2389) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Green, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-18-10 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-10 9:15am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2544 (Same As) 2010-02-04 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.