HI SB2688 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of an e-liquid container for an electronic smoking device unless the container is child-resistant and prohibits the sale of an e-liquid container for an e-liquid containing nicotine unless the e-liquid packaging is labeled with warning language. Establishes a violation as a penalty. Includes e-liquid under the definition of "hazardous substance" as used in the Hawaii Poison Prevention Packaging Act. (SB2688 HD1)
Title
E-liquid; Electronic Smoking Devices; Packaging Requirements; Prohibitions; Penalties
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1117-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 03-14-16 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 233) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2541) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Kim, Slom. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee on JDL has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2431) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1950 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).