HI SB2684 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes motor vehicle insurance requirements for transportation network companies and transportation network company drivers. Provides express authority for counties to regulate transportation network companies. (SB2684 HD1)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance; Transportation Network Companies; Transportation Network Company Drivers; Insurance Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1113-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-16-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 230) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2527) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-24-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRE, CPH. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2469 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 5