HI SB268 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB268
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of human services to create an integrated database of certain information related to homeless individuals for providers of homeless services and study the impact and feasibility of such a database. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 24) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB268 (Carry Over) 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB391 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB391 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.