HI SB2669 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 467B, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow service of process by substitute service, allows the Attorney General to accept assurances of discontinuance, and amends and clarifies the charity registration exemptions, and clarifies the time period for the filing of a charity's annual financial report. (SD2)
Title
Charitable Organizations; Solicitation of Funds from the Public
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 238) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2534) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine. | |
2010-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-19-10 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2071) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2516 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7