HI SB2668 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies sustainable development goals based on the United Nations' Global Goal Seven, affordable and clean energy. (SB2668 HD1)
Title
Relating To Sustainable Development Goals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1163-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-03-12 | House | Re-referred to EEP, EDB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 38 |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP, EDB, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2835) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2334) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 1:35PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |