HI SB2660 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expedites workers' compensation claims by firefighters by requiring the injured firefighter's private insurance to pay the costs of a controverted claim, subject to reimbursement upon a later finding that the claim is compensable. Requires reimbursement of up to 137 percent of the Medicare reimbursement rate for claims for certain specified types of cancer. (SB2660 HD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1334-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1181-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-15-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-09 | House | Re-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 254). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2933) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LBR/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2306) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to LBR/CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBR/CPH/PSM, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2116 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7