HI SB2658 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to EET/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to EET/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Kapolei jobs initiative program that offers tax incentives to increase the number of businesses willing to establish or relocate themselves in the Kapolei region. Repeals 6/30/2026.
Title
Kapolei Jobs Initiative; Qualified Business; Income Tax Credit; Unemployment Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2486 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2658&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2658_.HTM |