HI SB2658 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Act 055, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Act 055, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows solar energy facilities to occupy no more than 10% of a parcel, or 20 acres of land, within agricultural lands with soil classified as overall productivity rating class B or C if a special use permit has been granted and the area occupied by the solar energy facilities is also made available for compatible agricultural activities. Requires that solar energy facilities be decommissioned and removed within 12 months of the conclusion of operation. (SB2658 HD2)
Title
Solar Energy; Agricultural Land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Act 055, 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155). |
2014-05-01 | House | Act 055, on 4/30/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 672). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ige, Ihara, Ruderman, Wakai, Slom . 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-14-14. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-14-14. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-14 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 601). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee, Say, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Fale. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-27-14 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on EEP/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-14 at 11:30am. |
2014-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 03-25-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP/WAL with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1174-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP/WAL. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-13-14 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP/WAL, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 392) in amended form (SD 3). |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Hee, Kim). Transmitted to House. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-14. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report filed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 7 offered. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2609) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-27-14 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-14 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from ENE/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-14 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to ENE/AGL, WTL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AGL/ENE, WTL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |